Global Patent Index - EP 1038342 A1

EP 1038342 A1 2000-09-27 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A UNIPOLAR SEMICONDUCTOR LASER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A UNIPOLAR SEMICONDUCTOR LASER

Title (de)

KONTROLVERFAHREN EINER MONOPOLAREN HALBLEITERLASER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'UN LASER SEMICONDUCTEUR UNIPOLAIRE

Publication

EP 1038342 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99947549 A

Priority

  • FR 9902457 W
  • FR 9812812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2784514A1] The unipolar semiconductor laser control method has a stack of semiconductor layers forming a quantum well. Photonic energy is created by the difference between two energy levels (E1,E2). An optical pump transmits a control beam of photonic energy at a wavelength at or above the forbidden band of the semiconductor layer, from an initial photonic level (E3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/34 (2006.01); H01S 5/04 (2006.01); H01S 5/06 (2006.01); H01S 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 20/00 (2013.01); H01S 5/3402 (2013.01); H01S 5/041 (2013.01); H01S 5/0608 (2013.01); H01S 5/12 (2013.01); H01S 5/1228 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0022704A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2784514 A1 20000414; FR 2784514 B1 20010427; EP 1038342 A1 20000927; US 6738404 B1 20040518; WO 0022704 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20101107

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071112

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE