Global Patent Index - EP 1038353 A1

EP 1038353 A1 2000-09-27 - CIRCUIT FOR THE CLOCKED CONTROL OF A LOAD

Title (en)

CIRCUIT FOR THE CLOCKED CONTROL OF A LOAD

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM GETAKTETEN ANSTEUERN EINER LAST

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE SYNCHRONISEE D'UNE CHARGE

Publication

EP 1038353 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965181 A

Priority

  • DE 19754574 A
  • EP 9807614 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754574A1] The invention relates to a circuit for the clocked control of a load, especially for a motor vehicle. A control electrode of a field-effect transistor is connected to a voltage supply, said control electrode being subjected to clocked control by a control device. The load is connected to the voltage supply when the field-effect transistor is in its conducting state. The inventive circuit for the clocked control of a load is able to effect lowside or highside control of said load. According to the invention, the increased control voltage of the field-effect transistor (T) is extracted from an inductive interference signal (E) which occurs on a line (V) when higher currents are switched.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 17/687

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 17/06 (2006.01); H03K 17/0814 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03K 17/063 (2013.01); H03K 17/08142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930418A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754574 A1 19990610; AU 2049899 A 19990628; EP 1038353 A1 20000927; WO 9930418 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040110

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030827

2002-05-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE