Global patent index - EP 1038465 A2

EP 1038465 A2 2000-09-27 - Umbrella stand

Title (en)

Umbrella stand

Title (de)

Schirmständer

Title (fr)

Support pour parapluie

Publication

EP 1038465 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106517 A

Priority

DE 19913865 A

Abstract (en)

The parasol stand (10) has a horizontal foot (12) and a holder tube (14) for a parasol shaft (15). An adjustment device is provided to alter the orientation of the holder tube. The adjustment device has a hinge bearing (16) to hinge the holder tube within a swivel plane and holder pins (52) to secure the holder tube at a desired angle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Schirmständer 10 umfassend einen in einer horizontalen Fußebene sich erstreckenden Fuß 12 und ein mit dem Fuß 12 verbundenes Aufnahmerohr 14 zur Aufnahme eines Schirmschafts 15. Erfindungsgemäß ist eine Verstelleinrichtung 16, 30, 50, 52 zum Verstellen der Orientierung des Aufnahmerohrs 14 vorgesehen. Der erfindungsgemäße Schirmständer 10 ist universell einsetzbar und erlaubt es, einen beliebigen Schirm in gewünschter Weise zu neigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 17/00 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/2284 (2013.01); A45B 17/00 (2013.01); E04H 12/2238 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038465 A2 20000927; EP 1038465 A3 20011107; DE 19913865 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 45B 17/00 A, 7E 04H 12/22 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI