Global Patent Index - EP 1038468 A2

EP 1038468 A2 2000-09-27 - Cosmetic unit, in particular Mascara unit

Title (en)

Cosmetic unit, in particular Mascara unit

Title (de)

Farbkosmetik-Einheit, insbesondere Mascara-Einheit

Title (fr)

Element de produit cosmétique, en particulier mascara

Publication

EP 1038468 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123895 A

Priority

US 27204899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6029676A] In a coloring cosmetic unit, in particular a mascara unit, comprising a receptacle for the coloring cosmetic and a screw cap which can be screwed on an external thread of the receptacle neck and on which a handle with an applicator is mounted, it is provided, with a view to improving the properties of handling and use of such a coloring cosmetic unit, in particular to attaining optimal opening and closing properties, produceability by injection or blow molding at a low cost being nevertheless ensured, that the thread on the receptacle neck has a pitch greater than 2 mm, in particular approximately 3 mm.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Farbkosmetik-Einheit, insbesondere Mascara-Einheit (1), umfassend einen Behälter (2) für die Farbkosmetik und eine auf ein Außengewinde (10) des Behälterhalses (4) aufschraubbare Schraubkappe (5), an welcher ein Stiel mit einem Applikator (7) befestigt ist, ist es zur Verbesserung der Gebrauchs- und Handhabungseigenschaften einer solchen Farbkosmetikeinheit, insbesondere zur Erzielung optimalen Öffnens und Schließens, wobei gleichwohl eine kostengünstige spritz- und blastechnische Herstellbarkeit gewährleistet sein soll, vorgesehen, daß das Gewinde (10) am Behälterhals (4) eine Steigung von größer als 2 mm, insbesondere ca. 3 mm, aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/00; A45D 34/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6029676 A 20000229; DE 59905551 D1 20030618; EP 1038468 A2 20000927; EP 1038468 A3 20020508; EP 1038468 B1 20030514; ES 2199514 T3 20040216

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081203

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2005-12-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199514 T3

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1038468E

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905551 P 20030618

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEKA BRUSH GMBH

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI