Global Patent Index - EP 1038472 A1

EP 1038472 A1 2000-09-27 - Rest and support device for use with a keyboard attachable to the edge of a work surface

Title (en)

Rest and support device for use with a keyboard attachable to the edge of a work surface

Title (de)

Stütz- und Unterstützungsvorrichtung zur Verwendung mit einer Tastatur befestigbar an den Rand einer Arbeitsplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'appui et de soutien utilisable avec un clavier se fixant au bord d'un plan de travail

Publication

EP 1038472 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00430011 A

Priority

  • FR 9903634 A
  • FR 0000534 A

Abstract (en)

The support bar consists of a square-section tube (6) holding a circular-section cover (7) made of flexible material. The clamp supporting the tube has a J-shaped tube (12) with its straight end sloping down from the support bar to a clamp (4) with a hook (5) engaging the edge of the table. There may be several fastening holes (3) to allow the clamp to be held in different positions along the tube. The J-shaped end of the tube curves up towards the bottom of the table and there is a bush (9) accommodating an adjustment screw (10) which pushes up against the bottom of the table.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif ergonomique de soutien du dos et de la colonne vertébrale par soutien des membres supérieurs, ayant pour but d'éviter ou de soulager les douleurs vertébrales et d'augmenter le confort de l'utilisateur d'un bureau et d'un clavier. L'invention concerne un dispositif se fixant sur le plan de travail d'un bureau ou d'un meuble. Il permet de soutenir les avant-bras et les coudes de l'utilisateur en permettant de travailler sur un clavier ou avec une souris informatique. Ce dispositif se compose d'une partie de fixation (1) à la table ou au bureau, et d'une partie de soutien (2) sur laquelle repose les avant-bras ou les coudes de l'utilisateur. Ce dispositif réglable dans les trois dimensions permet l'adaptation aux différentes morphologies des utilisateurs ainsi qu'aux différentes configurations de bureaux ou meubles. Ce dispositif peut s'escamoter ou se replier contre le bureau en cas de non-utilisation. Les indications de ce dispositif sont d'éviter ou de soulager le « mal de dos », les problèmes vertébraux, de diminuer la fatigue et d'augmenter le confort. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01); A47B 21/03 (2006.01); A47B 97/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/0371 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0092 (2013.01); Y10S 248/918 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038472 A1 20000927; CA 2301927 A1 20000922; FR 2791236 A1 20000929; FR 2791236 B1 20010907; US 6325342 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050126

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030228

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI