Global Patent Index - EP 1038476 A1

EP 1038476 A1 2000-09-27 - Spring element

Title (en)

Spring element

Title (de)

Federelement

Title (fr)

Elément de ressort

Publication

EP 1038476 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103767 A

Priority

DE 29903423 U

Abstract (en)

The spring element has a foot section which rests on a support surface of a slat of the bed lattice. A support section supports the mattress. The ball-shaped sprung section (2) is rotationally symmetrical about a vertical axis, and consists partly of foamed elasticated rubber. The sprung body is hollow and impermeable to air.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Federelement (1;11) für einen Bettrost zur Befestigung auf einem Längs- oder Querholm oder auf einer Stützfläche eines Bettrostes, mit einem Fußteil (3), einem gummielastischen Federkörper (2;12) und einem Tragelement (9) als Matratzen- oder Leistenlagerung zur Verfügung gestellt, welches einfach und kostengünstig herstellbar ist und welches in jeder natürlichen Belastungsrichtung die gleichen Feder- und Dämpfungswerte aufweist, was dadurch erreicht wird, dass der Federkörper (2;12) zu seiner senkrechten Achse rotationssymetrisch ausgebildet ist und aus einem mindestens teilweise geschäumten gummielastischen Kunststoff besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/00; A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0653174 B1 19981209 - SENNE LIZENZ & PRODUKTE GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903423 U1 19990512; AT 264638 T 20040515; EP 1038476 A1 20000927; EP 1038476 B1 20040421; ES 2219216 T3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140223

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130224

2014-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140408

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-05-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006112

- Representative's name: FROHOFF, DIETMAR, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-01-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006112

- Representative's name: FROHOFF, DIETMAR, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-01-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006112

- Representative's name: KONRAD, ROLF UND FROHOFF RECHTSANWALTS- UND PA, DE

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-02-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219216 T3

2004-10-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006112 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI