Global patent index - EP 1038479 A2

EP 1038479 A2 2000-09-27 - Container for a liquid producing a decorative effect and method for projecting an image using the same

Title (en)

Container for a liquid producing a decorative effect and method for projecting an image using the same

Title (de)

Gefäss für Flüssigkeiten mit decorativem Effekt und Verfahren zur Projektion von Bildern mit Hilfe dieses Gefässes

Title (fr)

Récipient pour un liquide destiné à produire un effet décoratif et son utilisation dans un procédé de projection d'image

Publication

EP 1038479 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204492 A

Priority

KR 19990010365 A

Abstract (en)

An image-projecting hollow container for a liquid producing a decorative effect and a method for projecting an image using the hollow container for a liquid which can project an image projection substance located at the bottom of the image-projecting container to the surface of contained liquid when the image-projecting container is filled with liquid, such as water, beverage or liquor, etc. are disclosed. A user can view the projected image of an object located at the bottom of said container at the surface of the contained liquid while the container is filled with liquid matter, in order to excite and intrigue the user. Moreover, by using a company logo as the projected object, an advertising effect can be achieved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/22; B44C 5/00; B44F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/22 (2006.01); B44C 3/00 (2006.01); B44C 5/00 (2006.01); B44F 1/02 (2006.01); B44F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 5/00 (2013.01); A47G 19/2227 (2013.01); B44F 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038479 A2 20000927; EP 1038479 A3 20030122; AU 2250000 A 20001019; CA 2292727 A1 20000925; CN 1270107 A 20001018; JP 2000270990 A 20001003; KR 19990064513 A 19990805; SG 108224 A1 20050128

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI