Global patent index - EP 1038485 A3

EP 1038485 A3 2000-12-27 - Sealing arrangement for sealing the edge area of a sanitary tub to the wall or the floor of a room

Title (en)

Sealing arrangement for sealing the edge area of a sanitary tub to the wall or the floor of a room

Title (de)

Dichtungsanordnung zur Abdichtung des Randbereiches einer Sanitärwanne gegen Wand- und Bodenflächen eines Raumes

Title (fr)

Agencement de joint de la périphérie d'une cuve sanitaire avec un mur ou le sol d'une pièce

Publication

EP 1038485 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105192 A

Priority

DE 29905152 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19937977A1] The bath-tub or shower tray edge sealing element (1) has an application face shaped to correspond to the outer bath-tub or shower tray edge section. A water-tight sealing element (1), for sealing the joint between a wall and/or floor and the edge of a bath-tub or shower tray, has one or more sections (4, 5) with an application face having a shape corresponding to the outer section of the bath-tub or shower tray edge, to which it is to be adhesive bonded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01); E04F 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/008 (2013.01); E04F 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905152 U1 19990617; DE 19937977 A1 20001005; EP 1038485 A2 20000927; EP 1038485 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040429

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANZ KALDEWEI GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI