Global patent index - EP 1038491 A2

EP 1038491 A2 2000-09-27 - Floor cleaning device

Title (en)

Floor cleaning device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bodenreinigung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer des sols

Publication

EP 1038491 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101762 A

Priority

DE 19913785 A

Abstract (en)

The floor cleaner has a handle (2) pivotably mounted on a housing, whereby for the pivoting connection is produced by two journals engaging corresponding. apertures. The pivotal connection has different axial play for each different position. A first and/or a second journal (3,4) is/are made in the form of a pipe connector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Bodenreinigung insbesondere einen Staubsauger, bei dem an einem Gehäuse (1) ein Griff (2) schwenkbar angebracht ist. Zur sicheren Halterung des Griffs (1) in der Trageposition (S2) ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß das Spiel (SP2) der Lagerzapfen (3, 4) im Lager (A1, A2) in der Trageposition (S2) verringert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/327 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038491 A2 20000927; EP 1038491 A3 20010829; DE 19913785 A1 20001005; DE 19913785 C2 20010426

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI