Global Patent Index - EP 1038492 A2

EP 1038492 A2 2000-09-27 - Semicircular doormat

Title (en)

Semicircular doormat

Title (de)

Halbkreisförmige Fussmatte

Title (fr)

Paillasson semi-circulaire

Publication

EP 1038492 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310556 A

Priority

LK 1166999 A

Abstract (en)

A generally semi-circular novel doormat/floormat is made of twisted in brush fibre circular rods formed into predetermined patterns/designs which are fitted onto a partly concentrically formatted stiff frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038492 A2 20000927; EP 1038492 A3 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031117

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI