Global patent index - EP 1038492 A3

EP 1038492 A3 2000-12-06 - Semicircular doormat

Title (en)

Semicircular doormat

Title (de)

Halbkreisförmige Fussmatte

Title (fr)

Paillasson semi-circulaire

Publication

EP 1038492 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99310556 A

Priority

LK 1166999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1038492A2] A generally semi-circular novel doormat/floormat is made of twisted in brush fibre circular rods formed into predetermined patterns/designs which are fitted onto a partly concentrically formatted stiff frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038492 A2 20000927; EP 1038492 A3 20001206

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031117

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI