Global Patent Index - EP 1038493 A2

EP 1038493 A2 2000-09-27 - Universal mat with removable strips

Title (en)

Universal mat with removable strips

Title (de)

Universelle Fussmatte mit abnehmbaren Streifen

Title (fr)

Pallaisson universel à bandes détachables

Publication

EP 1038493 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101487 A

Priority

US 27436099 A

Abstract (en)

A rubber or plastic floor mat has a series of parallel upper ribs (130) on its upper surface which define slots (110) in which respective strips (10) or carpeting or the like are removably held. The strips are retained along their lengths by retaining means which run continually or continuously along the slots. The strip retainers include hook-and-loop fastening (e.g., VELCRO), and/or overhanging edges above the strip edges, preferably formed in one-piece fashion along the side of the upper ribs adjacent the slots. The overhangs may be interrupted, e.g., crenelated as seen from above, and may include bevels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038493 A2 20000927; EP 1038493 A3 20020626; AU 1357100 A 20000928; CA 2296864 A1 20000923

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060609

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI