Global Patent Index - EP 1038558 A2

EP 1038558 A2 2000-09-27 - Bat and ball game

Title (en)

Bat and ball game

Title (de)

Schläger und Ballspiel

Title (fr)

Jeu de raquette et balle

Publication

EP 1038558 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00650004 A

Priority

  • AU 2139099 A
  • AU 9900209 W

Abstract (en)

A bat and ball game apparatus comprises: a bat 1 to which a ball 2 is operatively coupled via an elastic tethering line 3; and means 5 for adjusting the tethering line to a required play length. The means 5 is mounted to the bat and can be manipulated to provide the required play length of the tethering line, which is then effective in repetitive striking of the ball with the bat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 67/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 67/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 67/20 (2013.01); A63B 21/153 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038558 A2 20000927; EP 1038558 A3 20020130; AU 710917 B3 19990930; JP 2000279565 A 20001010; WO 0057965 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033916

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI