Global Patent Index - EP 1038592 A2

EP 1038592 A2 2000-09-27 - Device for dosing and delivering flowing fluids

Title (en)

Device for dosing and delivering flowing fluids

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur dosierten Abgabe von strömenden Medien

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dosage et de distribution de fluides

Publication

EP 1038592 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104621 A

Priority

DE 19913159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913159C1] The appts. (10) to give a dosed delivery of a flow medium has a jet head to apply the medium in dots or lines where required. The intermediate plate (12) has an infinitely variable adjustment at the limit surface (15) along the openings of the feed channels at the applicator head (11). The applicator head (11) has a guide groove (16), parallel to the row of feed channel openings (17), to take a sliding block mounted to the intermediate plate (12) for its movement.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben ist eine Vorrichtung (10) zur dosierten Abgabe von strömenden Medien, insbesondere Schmelzkleber, Kaltleim, Schmierstoffe, Farben od. dgl., mit einem Auftragskopf (11), der eine Begrenzungsfläche (15) aufweist, in der zahlreiche beabstandete, in einer Reihe angeordnete, für ein strömendes Medium vorgesehene Zuführungskänale (17) münden, von denen mindestens einer mittels einer Zwischenplatte (12) mit einem Auftragsmodul (13) verbunden ist, welches mit einem Düsenkopf zur Aufbringung von Klebepunkten, Klebelinien bzw. Klebebereiche auf ein vorbeibewegtes Substrat versehen ist, wobei jede Zwischenplatte (12) einen den Abstand mindestens zweier Zuführungskanäle (17) überbrückenden Kanal sowie eine Montageposition für das Auftragsmodul (13) zur Verfügung stellt. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Vorrichtung zur dosierten Abgabe von strömenden Medien zu schaffen, bei der die Auftragsmodule (13) mit geringstem Aufwand in jeder Position befestigbar sind. Die Lösung dieser Aufgabe ergibt sich aus den Merk-malen des Kennzeichenteils, wonach die Zwischenplatte an der Begrenzungsfläche (15) entlang der Mündungen der Zuführkanäle (17) am Auftragskopf (11) stufenlos verstellbar angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; B05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 13/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/00 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B05B 15/08 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01); F04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0279 (2013.01); B05B 15/065 (2013.01); B05B 15/08 (2013.01); B05C 5/001 (2013.01); B05C 11/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913159 C1 20000720; EP 1038592 A2 20000927; EP 1038592 A3 20040324; EP 1038592 B1 20051228; JP 2000312852 A 20001114; JP 4607279 B2 20110105; US 6358322 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130303

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130303

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130304

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120406

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ITW DYNATEC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-01-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051229

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI NL SE

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI NL SE

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05C 5/02 A

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 15/06 B

2001-02-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITW DYNATEC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI