Global patent index - EP 1038602 A1

EP 1038602 A1 2000-09-27 - Method and device for straightening profiles

Title (en)

Method and device for straightening profiles

Title (de)

Verfahren und maschinelle Einrichtung zum Richten von Profilen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour cintrer des profiles

Publication

EP 1038602 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250100 A

Priority

  • DE 19915145 A
  • DE 10013229 A

Abstract (en)

A hydraulic system is used to determine the amount of straightening force applied to the profile by the straightening axles (3, 12) above and below it, and to determine the horizontal angle of the axles. The system allows the position of both the front and rear hydraulic cylinders (5, 6) to be quickly changed, as well as allowing a quick change in the rear hydraulic cylinder, so that the straightening force and/or horizontal angle can be altered during the actual straightening process. An Independent claim is also included for the profile straightening machine.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie eine maschinelle Einrichtung zum Richten von Profilen durch Beseitigung mehrachsiger Abweichungen vom geforderten Profil sowie von der geforderten Geradheit mit Hilfe ein oder mehrerer oberhalb und unterhalb des Richtgutes auf zueinander parallelen Richtachsen in Reihe angeordneter Richtwerkzeuge. Dabei erfolgt sowohl die Richtkraftanstellung wie auch die Verstellung der horizontalen Neigung der anstellbaren Richtachse hydraulisch, wobei das Hydrauliksystem so ausgelegt ist, dass sowohl eine schnelle Positionsveränderung am vorderen und hinteren Hydraulikzylinder wie auch ausschließlich am hinteren Hydraulikzylinder derart möglich ist, dass die Richtkraft und/oder die horizontale Neigung der anstellbaren Richtachse auch während des Richtens einstellbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038602 A1 20000927; EP 1038602 B1 20020522; AT 217815 T 20020615; US 6266989 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50000173

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50000173

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2004-03-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-03-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000173

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-27

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 217815

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010319

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI