Global Patent Index - EP 1038604 A1

EP 1038604 A1 2000-09-27 - Method and device for sealing the ends of hollow profiles in a hydroforming process

Title (en)

Method and device for sealing the ends of hollow profiles in a hydroforming process

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abdichtung der Enden von Hohlprofilen beim Innenhochdruckumformverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour étanchéitification des extrémités de profilés creux dans un procédé d' hydroformage

Publication

EP 1038604 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105255 A

Priority

DE 19911364 A

Abstract (en)

The ends of the profile are compressed prior to the forming process so that they become pressure-tight. The hollow profile is placed inside a mould tool (1, 2) and then a pressurised medium is introduced into the profile in order to form it into the shape of the mould tool cavity (3). An Independent claim is also included for the device used to seal the ends of the profile, using at least one sealing part (4.1, 4.2) movable at right angles to the workpiece length axis (A).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Abdichtung der Enden von Hohlprofilen (W) beim Innenhochdruckumformverfahren (IHV), wobei das Hohlprofil (W) in ein Umformwerkzeug (1,2) eingelegt und in diesem durch die Zuführung eines Druckmittels umgeformt wird. Die Enden des Hohlprofils (W) werden dabei vor der Durchführung des Innenhochdruckumformverfahrens druckmitteldicht verpreßt. Das Umformwerkzeug (1,2) besteht dabei aus mindestens zwei eine Gravur (3) entsprechend der zu erzeugenden Kontur des Werkstücks bildenden Werkzeugteilen und weist eine Druckmittelzuführung (5) für das Druckmedium auf. Erfindungsgemäß ist jedem Endbereich des Ausgangsteiles ein quer zur Längsachse (A) des Ausgangsteiles bewegbares Abdichtelement (4.1,4.2) zugeordnet, welches vor dem Innenhochdruckumformen das Ende des Hohlprofils (W) druckmitteldicht verpreßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/045 (2011.01); B21D 26/047 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/047 (2013.01); B21D 26/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038604 A1 20000927; DE 19911364 A1 20000928; DE 19911364 C2 20011115

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR. MELEGHY HYDROFORMING GMBH & CO. KG

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI