Global Patent Index - EP 1038606 A3

EP 1038606 A3 2000-11-02 - Gearing part and manufacturing method thereof

Title (en)

Gearing part and manufacturing method thereof

Title (de)

Getriebeteil und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément de transmission et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1038606 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105129 A

Priority

DE 19912841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912841A1] The sprocket production process operates on a transversely running strip (17). A rotary-symmetrical workpiece (10) is clamped in a pressure roll device and rotated while being shaped by a roll tool. Before the strip is deformed, at least one circumferential groove (15) is made in the strip. The strip is then deformed axially to either side of the groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/28; B21H 5/02; B21K 1/30; B23P 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 55/17 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01); B21J 5/02 (2006.01); B21J 5/08 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01); B21K 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/02 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49458 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4946 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49467 (2013.01); Y10T 74/1987 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19907 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] DE 3711927 C1 19881013 - LEIFELD & CO
  • [A] DE 19701565 A1 19970814 - LEICO WERKZEUGMASCHB GMBH & CO [DE]
  • [X] DR. ING. NIEMANN: "Maschinenelemente - Entwerfen, Berechnen und Gestalten im Maschinenbau", 1961, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/GÖTTINGEN/HEIDELBERG - ZWEITER BAND, XP002140996

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912841 A1 19991111; DE 19912841 B4 20070621; EP 1038606 A2 20000927; EP 1038606 A3 20001102; EP 1038606 B1 20031008; JP 2000301282 A 20001031; US 6449845 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003963

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003963 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-10-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-12-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A GEARING PART

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI