Global Patent Index - EP 1038612 A1

EP 1038612 A1 2000-09-27 - Twin roll continuous casting of strips of carbon steel

Title (en)

Twin roll continuous casting of strips of carbon steel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bändern aus Kohlenstoffstahl durch Stranggiessen mittels Doppelwalzen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de bandes en acier au carbone par coulée continue entre deux cylindres

Publication

EP 1038612 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400573 A

Priority

FR 9903778 A

Abstract (en)

Carbon steel strips (7) of thickness not more than 10 mm are produced by continuous casting of molten steel (4) containing Mn and Si between the lateral copper or copper alloy surfaces (3) of two internally cooled and rotating horizontal rolls (1, 1'), in an atmosphere of 40-100 % nitrogen, the remainder being an inert gas insoluble in the molten steel, at the meniscus (8, 8'). The molten steel contains (in weight %): C 0.5%, Mn 0.2-2%, Si 0.2%, the ratio Mn/Si being 3-16, optionally Al+Ti+Zr 0.10%, O 100 ppm, preferably 30-700 ppm, and iron and unavoidable impurities the remainder. The lateral surfaces (3, 3') of the rolls (1, 1') have contacting pits (2) providing the surfaces with roughness Rz 40-200 microns and roughness Ra 10-40 microns . The inert gas insoluble in the molten steel can be a mixture of such gases. The cast strip is subjected to in-line hot rolling after casting. Independent claims are given for: (a) a carbon steel strip of thickness not greater than 10 mm and produced by the above process; and (b) the rolls, as above, used for the continuous casting of thin metal strips.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de fabrication de bandes (7) d'épaisseur inférieure ou égale à 10 mm en acier au carbone directement à partir d'acier liquide (4), par coulée dudit acier liquide (4) entre les surfaces latérales (3) en cuivre ou alliage de cuivre de deux cylindres horizontaux (1, 1') en rotation refroidis intérieurement, caractérisé en ce que : ledit acier liquide (4) a la composition, en pourcentages pondéraux : carbone <= 0,5%, manganèse de 0,2 à 2%, silicium <= 2%, le rapport Mn% / Si% étant compris entre 3 et 16, optionnellement aluminium + titane + zirconium <= 0,10%, le reste étant du fer et des impuretés habituelles ; lesdites surfaces latérales (3, 3') des cylindres (1, 1') comportent des fossettes (2) jointives, imposant auxdites surfaces (3, 3') une rugosité Rz comprise entre 40 et 200 µm et une rugosité Ra comprise entre 10 et 40 µm ; et l'atmosphère environnant le ménisque (8, 8') de l'acier liquide (4) présent entre les cylindres (1, 1') comprend entre 40 et 100% d'azote, le restant étant composé d'un gaz neutre insoluble dans l'acier liquide (4) ou d'un mélange de tels gaz neutres. L'invention concerne également une bande susceptible d'être produite par ledit procédé, et un cylindre de coulée pour sa mise en pratique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0651 (2013.01); B22D 11/0622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038612 A1 20000927; EP 1038612 B1 20030716; AT 245066 T 20030815; AU 2064900 A 20000928; AU 755008 B2 20021128; BR 0001288 A 20001017; CA 2299674 A1 20000926; CA 2299674 C 20090512; DE 60003861 D1 20030821; DE 60003861 T2 20040826; FR 2791286 A1 20000929; FR 2791286 B1 20010504; JP 2000301295 A 20001031; US 2003029599 A1 20030213; US 6491089 B1 20021210; US 6679313 B2 20040120

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 245066 T

- Effective date: 20120303

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120303

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121001

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110311

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOLLAC

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003861 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POIRIER, FRANCOIS

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VICENTE, PATRICE

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COMMARIEU, FRANCOISE

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FARAL, MICHEL

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARCHIONNI, CHRISTIAN

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SELARIES, JACQUES

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI