Global Patent Index - EP 1038632 A2

EP 1038632 A2 2000-09-27 - Method and repairstick for reconditioning a cutting surface on a cutting tool

Title (en)

Method and repairstick for reconditioning a cutting surface on a cutting tool

Title (de)

Verfahren und Reparaturstift zur Wiederherstellung einer Schneidfläche an einem Schneidwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Procédé et broche de réparation pour remettre en état une surface de coupe d'un outil tranchant

Publication

EP 1038632 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101403 A

Priority

DE 19913789 A

Abstract (en)

The cutting tool has in the cutting edge area excess material (12) which is cleared away by means of an abrasive grinding element (2) mounted on the repair pin (1) until a reference element (3) fixed on the repair pin comes into contact with a tool surface (13) corresponding to the original cutting edge. The repair pin has an abrasive grinding element (2) and non-abrasive reference element arranged next to each other in the axial direction of the pin. The maximum dimension of the reference element in the radial direction of the pin is at least as large as that of the grinding element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Wiederherstellung von Schneidkanten an Schneidwerkzeugen. Auf diese Schneidkanten wird im Zuge der Instandhaltung - z.B. durch Laserauftragsschweißen - Überschußmaterial aufgebracht, das vor Wiedereinsatz des Schneidwerkzeugs (7) selektiv abgetragen werden muß. Hierzu wird erfindungsgemäß ein Reparaturstift (1) verwendet, der ein abrasives Schleifelement (2) und ein nichtabrasives Referenzelement (3) umfaßt, wobei das Referenzelement (3) in Radialrichtung mindestens ebenso groß ist wie das Schleifelement (2). Zum Abtragen des Überschußmaterials (12) wird das zu bearbeitende Schneidwerkzeug (7) so gegenüber dem Reparaturstift (1) bewegt, daß das Schleifelement (2) axial mit dem Überschußmaterial (12) überlappt, während das Referenzelement (3) axial mit einem Bereich des Schneidwerkzeugs (7) überlappt, welcher der ursprünglichen Werkzeugoberfläche (10) entspricht. Der Abtragprozeß wird so lange fortgesetzt, bis das Referenzelement (3) in Kontakt mit der ursprünglichen Schneidfläche (10) des Schneidwerkzeugs (7) kommt und ein weiteres Eindringen des Schleifelements (2) verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 3/00; B24B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 3/60 (2006.01); B24B 17/02 (2006.01); B24D 5/02 (2006.01); B24D 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/02 (2013.01); B24B 3/60 (2013.01); B24B 17/02 (2013.01); B24D 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038632 A2 20000927; EP 1038632 A3 20030709; DE 19913789 A1 20000928; DE 19913789 C2 20011018

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 3/00 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 17/02 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24D 5/14 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 24B 3/60 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI