Global patent index - EP 1038635 A2

EP 1038635 A2 2000-09-27 - Polishing apparatus

Title (en)

Polishing apparatus

Title (de)

Poliervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de polissage

Publication

EP 1038635 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302005 A

Priority

US 27064299 A

Abstract (en)

A chemical mechanical polishing system having a dual position slurry/rinse arm for moving between a polishing position in which slurry is supplied to a polishing pad from a location remote from the polishing pad's center, and a rinsing position in which rinsing fluid is supplied from a location above or adjacent the polishing pad's center. The rinsing fluid is preferably sprayed from one or more nozzles that extend from the edge of the polishing pad to the center of the polishing pad. Preferably, in the polishing position, the slurry/rinse arm is positioned horizontally remote from the polishing pad's center and supplies slurry to the polishing pad via a horizontally angled slurry supply line. The slurry/rinse arm may include a gimbled brush for contacting the polishing pad when the slurry/rinse arm is in the rinsing position, and may further include brush nozzles positioned to direct rinsing fluid to the brush so as to rinse particles therefrom. Rinsing fluid nozzles may also be angled to spray rinsing fluid in front of the brush, so as to prewet the polishing pad.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04; B24B 53/007; H01L 21/306

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/04 (2012.01); B24B 53/007 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/017 (2013.01); B24B 37/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038635 A2 20000927; EP 1038635 A3 20030514; JP 2000280165 A 20001010; TW 434113 B 20010516

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI