Global Patent Index - EP 1038637 A2

EP 1038637 A2 2000-09-27 - Abrasive articles

Title (en)

Abrasive articles

Title (de)

Schleifgegenstände

Title (fr)

Articles abrasif

Publication

EP 1038637 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125307 A

Priority

  • EP 96932205 A
  • US 9614570 W

Abstract (en)

This invention pertains to an abrasive article comprising precisely shaped particles. The abrasive article may be a coated abrasive article, a bonded abrasive article or a nonwoven abrasive article. The precisely shaped particles may further comprise abrasive grits, fillers, grinding aids and lubricants. The precisely shaped particles can be made according to the following method: (a) providing a production tool having a three-dimensional body which has at least one continuous surface, said surface containing at least one opening formed in said continuous surface, said at least one opening providing access to a cavity in said three-dimensional body; (b) providing a dispensing means capable of introducing a binder precursor comprising a thermosetting resin into said at least one cavity through said at least one opening; (c) providing a means, within a curing zone, for at least partially curing said binder precursor; (d) introducing said binder precursor into at least a portion of said at least one cavity; (e) continuously moving said at least one cavity through said curing zone to at least partially cure said binder precursor to provide a solidified, handleable binder having a shape corresponding to that portion of the cavity into which the binder precursor has been introduced; (f) removing said binder from said at least one cavity; and (g) converting said binder to form a precisely shaped particle. Steps (f) and (g) may be conducted simultaneously. The particles can be bonded together to form a shaped mass, e.g. a wheel; alternatively, the particles can be bonded to a backing to form a coated abrasive article; or the particles can be bonded into a fibrous, nonwoven substrate to form a nonwoven abrasive article.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 3/28; B24D 3/34; B24D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/02 (2006.01); B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 3/34 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/02 (2006.01); C08J 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/344 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 3/34 (2013.01); B24D 11/00 (2013.01); B24D 11/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810896 A1 19980319; AU 7108396 A 19980402; BR 9612737 A 19990824; CA 2264872 A1 19980319; DE 69629054 D1 20030814; DE 69629054 T2 20040422; DE 69637418 T2 20090122; EP 0925151 A1 19990630; EP 0925151 B1 20030709; EP 1038637 A2 20000927; EP 1038637 A3 20011212; EP 1038637 B1 20080123; JP 2001500068 A 20010109; ZA 9707477 B 19990222

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69637418

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150911

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150911

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140910

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-12-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69637418 P 20080313

2008-01-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0925151 P

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ABRASIVE ARTICLES

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-09-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 925151

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT