Global Patent Index - EP 1038637 A3

EP 1038637 A3 2001-12-12 - Abrasive article and method of making

Title (en)

Abrasive article and method of making

Title (de)

Schleifkörper und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Article abrasif et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1038637 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125307 A

Priority

  • EP 96932205 A
  • US 9614570 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810896A1] This invention pertains to an abrasive article comprising preci sely shaped particles. The abrasive article may be a coated abrasive article, a bonded abrasive or a nonwoven abrasive article. The precisely shaped particles may further comprise abrasive grits, fillers, grinding aids and lubricants. The precisely shaped particles can be made according to the following method: (a) providing a production tool having a three-dimensional body which has at least one continuous surface, said surface containing at least one opening formed in said continuous surface, said at least one opening providing access to a cavity in said three-dimensional body; (b) providing a dispensing means capable of introducing a binder precursor comprising a thermosetting resin into said at least one cavity through said at least one opening; (c) providing a means, within a curing zone, for at least partially curing said binder precursor; (d) introducing said binder precursor into at least a portion of said at least one cavity; (e) continuously moving said at least one cavity through said curing zone to at least partially cure said binder precursor to provide a solidified, handleable binder having a shape corresponding to that portion of the cavity into which the binder precursor has been introduced; (f) removing said binder from said at least one cavity; and (g) converting said binder to form a precisely shaped particle. Steps (f) and (g) may be conducted simultaneously. The particles can be bonded together to form a shaped mass, e.g., a wheel; alternatively, the particles can be bonded to a backing to form a coated abrasive article; or the particles can be bonded into a fibrous, nonwoven substrate to form a non-woven abrasive article.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 3/28; B24D 3/34; B24D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/02 (2006.01); B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 3/34 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/02 (2006.01); C08J 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/344 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 3/34 (2013.01); B24D 11/00 (2013.01); B24D 11/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810896 A1 19980319; AU 7108396 A 19980402; BR 9612737 A 19990824; CA 2264872 A1 19980319; DE 69629054 D1 20030814; DE 69629054 T2 20040422; DE 69637418 T2 20090122; EP 0925151 A1 19990630; EP 0925151 B1 20030709; EP 1038637 A2 20000927; EP 1038637 A3 20011212; EP 1038637 B1 20080123; JP 2001500068 A 20010109; ZA 9707477 B 19990222

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69637418

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150911

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150911

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140910

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-12-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69637418 P 20080313

2008-01-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0925151 P

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ABRASIVE ARTICLES

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-09-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 925151

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT