Global patent index - EP 1038645 A2

EP 1038645 A2 2000-09-27 - Method and apparatus for working glazing beads, preferably for making mitre cuts for window frames, in particular with acute or obtuse angles at the frame corners

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for working glazing beads, preferably for making mitre cuts for window frames, in particular with acute or obtuse angles at the frame corners

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von Glasleisten, bevorzugt zur Durchführung von Schrägschnitten, für Fensterrahmen, insbesondere mit spitzen oder stumpfen Winkeln der Rahmenecken

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour travailler une parclose, de préférence pour coupes d'onglets, pour cadres de fenêtres, en particulier avec angles aigus ou obtus dans les coins du cadre

Publication

EP 1038645 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106571 A

Priority

DE 19913610 A

Abstract (en)

The method is for cutting of acute, obtuse, and right angles (30) in glass battens (5,6). A clamping device (8) has two clamping plates (11,12). The plates each engage on one profile leg forming a frame corner, in a position corresponding to the angle of that corner, and are relatively aligned and locked in that position. A finishing device (23), esp. a machine table is associated with the clamping device, and has a saw or similar cutting device. The clamping device is locked in a position defined relative to the saw. A batten is placed on each clamping plate at different vertical levels, and an angled cut is made by the saw through the battens.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von Glasleisten (5, 6, 7) für Fensterrahmen (1) zur Durchführung von Schrägschnitten (30) an Glasleisten (5, 6, 7) für spitz- oder stumpfwinklige Rahmenecken, wobei wenigstens eine Spanneinrichtung (8, 9, 10) vorgesehen ist, die zwei Spannplatten (11, 12) aufweist. Die Spannplatten (11, 12) können durch Anlage an jeweils einen der beiden eine Rahmenecke bildenden Profilschenkel (2, 3, 4) in einer dem jeweiligen Winkel der Rahmenecke entsprechenden Winkel zueinander ausgerichtet und festgestellt werden. Die Spanneinrichtung (8, 9, 10) wird auf einer Bearbeitungseinheit (23 mit einer zugeordneten Säge in einer bezüglich der Trenneinrichtung definierten Position festgelegt, wobei an je einer der Spannplatten (11, 12) eine Glasleiste (5, 6, 7) in vertikal unterschiedlicher Höhe angelegt ist und mittels der Trenneinrichtung der Schrägschnitt (30) durch die Glasleisten (5, 6, 7) durchgeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 5/02; B27B 27/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 27/06 (2006.01); B27G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 27/06 (2013.01); B27G 5/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038645 A2 20000927; EP 1038645 A3 20011017; EP 1038645 B1 20041103; AT 281286 T 20041115

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100327

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100327

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100327

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROTOX G.M.B.H. B. EISENBACH

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008460

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EISENBACH, BERND

2004-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EISENBACH, BERNHARD

2004-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIEWRZOLL, PETER

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 27G 5/02 A, 7B 27B 27/06 B, 7B 27B 33/20 B, 7G 01B 3/56 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI