Global Patent Index - EP 1038647 A1

EP 1038647 A1 2000-09-27 - Stone cutting tool having diamond segments with variable height, width and length

Title (en)

Stone cutting tool having diamond segments with variable height, width and length

Title (de)

Steinschneidwerkzeug mit Diamantsegmenten unterschiedlicher Höhe, Breite und Länge

Title (fr)

Outil de coupe de la pierre à segments diamantés dont la hauteur, la largeur et la longeur different d'un segment à l'autre

Publication

EP 1038647 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830160 A

Priority

EP 99830160 A

Abstract (en)

Tool (1) for cutting marble, granite or stone in general comprising a metal core (10), for example a disk or a blade, and a diamond segments (12,14,16) applied by welding to the core, arranged in repeated sequences of three different segments. The segments contained in each sequence have progressively decreasing heights and increasing cutting widths in the cutting direction of the tool. These segments have different lengths to maintain constant their volume and therefore the amount of abrasive material present in each segment. At least one of the segments comprised in a sequence has a central frontal drainage (60,62) made of a longitudinal groove. Abrasive segment (30) comprises at least two different portions (32,34,36), arranged in sequence according to a cutting direction of the tool, each portion having, relative to the portion preceding it in the sequence, respectively lower height and greater cutting width. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/12; B23D 61/02; B23D 61/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 61/02 (2006.01); B23D 61/12 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23D 61/021 (2013.01); B23D 61/121 (2013.01); B28D 1/124 (2013.01); B28D 1/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038647 A1 20000927; EP 1038647 B1 20030716; ES 2203051 T3 20040401; PT 1038647 E 20031128

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100323

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100322

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090922

2009-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090922

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090307

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090309

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070301

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203051 T3

2004-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-03-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STONE CUTTING TOOL HAVING DIAMOND SEGMENTS WITH VARIABLE HEIGHT, WIDTH AND LENGTH

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEO S.R.L.

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL PT

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR LI

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR LI

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI