Global Patent Index - EP 1038673 A1

EP 1038673 A1 2000-09-27 - Device for feeding ink to an ink fountain of a printing machine

Title (en)

Device for feeding ink to an ink fountain of a printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Versorgung eines Farbspeichers einer Druckmaschine mit Farbe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour alimenter en encre un bac à encre d'une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1038673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105719 A

Priority

DE 19912881 A

Abstract (en)

A multi-task rail (11) spans the ink reservoir area and contains at least one supply channel (5) with associated outlet openings (4) and at least one downwardly open insert channel (16) for holding at least one filler sensor (9). The multi task rail is provided with covers at the ends and at least one cover contains an end of the ink supply pipe as well as the valve assembly and operating device associated therewith. The multi task rail can have a further channel (19) for a control device (10) which operates the operating device.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zur Versorgung wenigstens eines Abteils eines Farbspeichers (1) einer Druckmaschine mit Farbe mit wenigstens einem über den zugeordneten Farbspeicherbereich hinweggehenden, mit dem Farbspeicher (1) zugeordneten Auslassöffnungen (4) versehenen Versorgungskanal (5) der an eine Farbzuführleitung (6a,b) angeschlossen ist, die mit einer Ventilanordnung (7) versehen ist, und mit wenigstens einem Füllstandssensor (9), dessen Signale mittels einer Steuereinrichtung (10) zu Schaltbefehlen für eine der Ventilanordnung (7) zugeordnete Betätigungseinrichtung (8) verarbeitbar sind, lässt sich dadurch der vor Ort erforderliche Montageaufwand auf ein Minimum reduzieren, dass eine den zugeordneten Farbspeicherbereich überspannende Multifunktionsschiene (11) vorgesehen ist, die zumindest den Versorgungskanal (5) mit zugeordneten Auslassöffnungen (4) sowie zumindest einen nach unten offenen Einschubkanal 16 zur Aufnahme wenigstens eines Füllstandssenors (9) enthält und die mit stirnseitigen Deckeln (13,14) versehen ist, wobei zumindest ein Deckel (14) zumindest einen Endbereich (6b) einer Farbzuführleitung sowie die dieser zugeordnete Ventilanordnung (7) mit zugehöriger Betätigungseinrichtung (8) enthält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038673 A1 20000927; EP 1038673 B1 20030528; DE 19912881 A1 20001005; DE 19912881 C2 20010222; JP 2000280448 A 20001010; US 6231170 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130305

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070317

2007-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002320 P 20030703

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI