Global patent index - EP 1038675 A3

EP 1038675 A3 2001-04-04 - Ink jet recording head and method for manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Ink jet recording head and method for manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à jet d'encre et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1038675 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00106532 A

Priority

JP 8406299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1038675A2] An ink jet recording head (55) may improve the packing efficiency of the ink into the pressure generating chamber (19), and improve the ejection efficiency of the ink through the ink ejection nozzle (41) to realize a high quality gradation expression in printing operations. The recording head (55) comprises: a pressure generating chamber (19) communicating with an ink reservoir (40); a vibrating plate (23) which faces the pressure generating chamber (19) and is provided with an island-like convex portion (18); and, a piezoelectric element (20) arranged so as to be brought into contact with the island-like convex portion (18) of the vibrating plate (23) to vibrate the plate (23), and thereby forcing ink droplets to be ejected from the nozzle (41). The vibrating plate (23) comprises: a first metallic layer or stainless steel member (11) brought into contact with the piezoelectric element (20), a second metallic layer or thin nickel film(15) exposed to the pressure generating chamber (19), and a polymer film (13) of a high polymeric organic compound interposed between the first metallic layer (11) and the second metallic layer (15). The island-like convex portion (18) of the vibrating plate (23) is formed by etching a surface of the first metallic layer (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1626 (2013.01); B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2/1612 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/1642 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01); B41J 2202/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038675 A2 20000927; EP 1038675 A3 20010404; JP 2000272129 A 20001003; JP 3339569 B2 20021028

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: INK JET RECORDING HEAD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI