Global patent index - EP 1038679 A1

EP 1038679 A1 2000-09-27 - Device and system for filling an ink tank

Title (en)

Device and system for filling an ink tank

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Anordnung zum Befüllen eines Tintentanks

Title (fr)

Dispositif et système pour remplir un reservoir d'encre

Publication

EP 1038679 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105816 A

Priority

DE 19912620 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a refilling container (3) for connection to the reservoir (2) via an adapter (4) with the container and reservoir arranged one above the other in the filling position, whereby the adapter has at least one housing and at least two connections to the reservoir and filling container. The ink reservoir, refilling container and adapter form a hermetically sealed system with no connection to the atmosphere in the assembled state. In the filling position the filling process takes place under gravity, without pressure or with a vacuum. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for filling an ink reservoir.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und eine Anordnung zum Befüllen eines Tintentanks 2, 20, für einen Tintenspeicher bei einem Ink - Jet - System, einem Plotter oder einer sonstigen automatischen Registrier-, Schreib- oder Zeichenanlagen, wobei ein Nachfüllbehälter 3, 30 und der Tintentank 2, 20 durch einen Adapter 4, 40 verbunden werden und in Füllposition F im wesentlichen übereinander angeordnet sind und wobei der Adapter 4, 40 mindestens ein Gehäuse und mindestens zwei Anschlüsse für die zu verbindenden Behälter 3, 30 und Tanks 2, 20 aufweist, wobei der Tintentank (2, 20), der Nachfüllbehälter (3, 30) und der Adapter (4, 40) in zusammengesetztem Zustand ein in sich hermetisch abgeschlossenes System bilden, das keine Verbindung zur Atmosphäre aufweisen und wobei in Füllposition (F) der Füllvorgang drucklos, durch Schwerkraft oder mit Unterdruck erfolgt. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17503 (2013.01); B41J 2/17506 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038679 A1 20000927; DE 19912620 A1 20001005; US 6360795 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070123

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060911

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010127

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI