Global Patent Index - EP 1038683 A1

EP 1038683 A1 2000-09-27 - Direct electrostatic printing apparatus

Title (en)

Direct electrostatic printing apparatus

Title (de)

Direktes elektrostatisches Druckgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'impression électrostatique direct

Publication

EP 1038683 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106570 A

Priority

JP 8369099 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a direct printing apparatus reducing the number of driver IC, contemplating cost reduction, increasing a printing speed and preventing aperture clogging. Each aperture (56) has a size allowing the printing particles (38) for a plurality of dots to pass through it. Control electrodes of each aperture (56) comprises a first electrode (68) positioned at the bearing member side and a second electrode (70) positioned at the backing electrode side. The second electrode (70) is divided into a number equivalent to the maximum number of the dots possible to pass through each aperture (56). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/415; G03G 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/385 (2006.01); B41J 2/415 (2006.01); G03G 15/05 (2006.01); G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/346 (2013.01); B41J 2/4155 (2013.01); G03G 2217/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038683 A1 20000927; AU 4159800 A 20001016; JP 2000272162 A 20001003; WO 0058103 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARRAY PRINTERS AB

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020213

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHIBATA, YOSHIFUMI C/O MINOLTA CO., LTD.

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI