Global Patent Index - EP 1038706 A2

EP 1038706 A2 2000-09-27 - Convertible vehicle

Title (en)

Convertible vehicle

Title (de)

Cabriolet-Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule cabriolet

Publication

EP 1038706 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104247 A

Priority

DE 19912357 A

Abstract (en)

The rear windscreen (3) which is provided in the foldaway roof (4) is held in a frame (6) which is opened downwards on the cover side so that as the roof is opened and closed so the rear windscreen is swivelled up relative to the frame. The swivel-up movement of the rear windscreen and the opening and closing movement of the roof are coupled together. In the closed position the frame stands up on the window ledge and as the roof is opened and closed is guided in a path of movement which is lifted up.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Cabriolet-Fahrzeug (1) mit einem auffaltbaren, mit einer Heckscheibe (3) versehenen Dach (4), das in einem rückwärtigen Fahrzeugbereich ablegbar ist und über zumindest einen Spannbügel (10) im geschlossenen Zustand gegenüber der Karosserie (2) verspannt ist, wobei der Spannbügel (10) zum Öffnen des Daches (4) nach vorne verschwenkbar ist und hierbei eine Vorwärtsverlagerung der Heckscheibe (3) bewirkt. Um bei einer derartigen Ausbildung die Vorwärtsverlagerung des die Heckscheibe umfassenden hinteren Verdeckbereiches ohne Behinderung durch hochstehende Teile, wie z. B. hinter Kopfstützen oder Überrollbügel, ausführen zu können, ist vorgesehen, daß die Heckscheibe (3) in einem verdeckseitigen, nach unten geöffneten Rahmen (6) gehalten und während des Öffnens und Schließens des Daches (4) gegenüber diesem Rahmen (6) aufschwenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/1823 (2013.01); B60J 1/183 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038706 A2 20000927; EP 1038706 A3 20010718; EP 1038706 B1 20040707; DE 19912357 C1 20001102; US 6302470 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50006992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140302

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140302

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AUTOMOTIVE OY, FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KRONTHALER, SCHMIDT & COLL. PATENTANWALTSKANZL, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: VALMET AUTOMOTIVE OY, FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20131209

2013-12-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131114 AND 20131120

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110302

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-10 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20080226

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DR. ING. H.C.F PORSCHE AG

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-06-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DR. ING. H.C.F PORSCHE AG

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041116

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI