Global Patent Index - EP 1038750 A1

EP 1038750 A1 2000-09-27 - Rolling damping damper for a railroad vehicle and method for damping

Title (en)

Rolling damping damper for a railroad vehicle and method for damping

Title (de)

Roll-Dämpfer für ein Schienenfahrzeug und Dämpfungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Amortisseur du roulis pour un véhicule ferroviaire et procédé d'amortissement

Publication

EP 1038750 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99302156 A

Priority

EP 99302156 A

Abstract (en)

To provide a damper for damping rolling of a railroad vehicle and a damping method, in which controlling of an attenuation force in an attenuation force control circuit is carried out merely by a vehicle body speed signal of a vehicle body without using a damper speed signal, and even when a power is off, controlling can be made in common by the same attenuation force control circuit as that is used at the time of control without the provision of a separate exclusive-use circuit, whereby the control system is simplified, the number of parts is reduced, and miniaturization can be accomplished. A damper C for damping rolling of a railroad vehicle, comprising: a cylinder 106 interposed between a bogie A and a vehicle body B, a flow passage 121 merely allowing a flow of working fluid from a head-side chamber 111 to a rod-side chamber 112 of the cylinder, a reservoir 107 leading to the head-side chamber of the cylinder through a suction valve 122, a flow passage 120 for communicating the head-side chamber with the reservoir, an unload valve 118 for pressure side disposed in the flow passage, and an attenuation force control circuit 8 interposed between the rod-side chamber and the reservoir, said attenuation force control circuit having a fixed restrictor 126, and a proportional electromagnetic relief valve V provided in parallel with the fixed restrictor to continuously control a relief set pressure from the maximum pressure to the minimum pressure as an input from a proportional solenoid 45 increases, said proportional electromagnetic relief valve comprising a valve casing 7, an input port 32 and a return port 34 provided in the valve casing, a valve seat body 20 provided with a valve body 27 for intermittently communicating the input port with the return port, a spring 30 for setting a relief pressure for biasing the valve body in a closing direction, an adjusting screw body 9 having a pressing body 17 for supporting a base end of the spring slidably disposed, a stop member 19 provided on the adjusting screw body to control a stroke of the pressing body, an adjusting threaded rod 14 threadedly inserted into the adjusting screw body to support the base end of the pressing body, a pressure receiving chamber 18 formed between the pressing body and the adjusting screw body, a solenoid for applying a force in an opening direction to the valve body, and a switching valve 48 positioned between the valve body and a movable core 46 in the solenoid to switch the mode from communication with the return port of the pressure receiving chamber to communication with the input port thereof while pressing the valve body through the excitation of the solenoid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/245 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038750 A1 20000927; EP 1038750 B1 20050817; DE 69926724 D1 20050922; DE 69926724 T2 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100319

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090306

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69926724

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030926

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAWASAKI, HARUHITO

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAZATO, MASAKAZU

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ARAI, JUNICHI

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HASIMOTO, KOUZI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI