Global Patent Index - EP 1038763 A1

EP 1038763 A1 2000-09-27 - COVER OR DECK STRUCTURE FOR MARINE VESSEL

Title (en)

COVER OR DECK STRUCTURE FOR MARINE VESSEL

Title (de)

ABDECKUNGS ODER DECKSSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN WASSERFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE PONT OU DE RECOUVREMENT POUR BATEAUX

Publication

EP 1038763 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98961355 A

Priority

  • JP 9805674 W
  • JP 34671197 A

Abstract (en)

A cover or deck structure for marine vessels. Beams (5) having a U-shaped or V-shaped cross section are welded and fixed to a back surface of a top plate (4) at predetermined intervals with opened surfaces thereof in close contact with the top plate (4). The cover or deck is enhanced in rigidity, reduced in welding distortion and improved in its workability. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 19/14; B63B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/48 (2006.01); B63B 19/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/14 (2013.01); B63B 3/48 (2013.01); B63B 2003/265 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038763 A1 20000927; EP 1038763 A4 20021016; AU 1681999 A 19990705; CN 1113773 C 20030709; CN 1282300 A 20010131; KR 100425227 B1 20040330; PL 193747 B1 20070330; PL 341011 A1 20010312; WO 9930961 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-10-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 19/14 A, 7B 63B 3/48 B, 7B 63B 3/34 B

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRATA, MASARU

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUZIKI, MASAKI

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ISHINABE, SYUUICHI

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMANAKA, HIROSHI

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK