Global Patent Index - EP 1038773 A1

EP 1038773 A1 2000-09-27 - Packaging machine

Title (en)

Packaging machine

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 1038773 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104887 A

Priority

DE 19912491 A

Abstract (en)

A frame (1) has input (2) and output (3) sides. Several tray carriers (4) set one after the other on a track from the input to the output side pick up trays (16). A driving mechanism (9,13) moves the tray carriers forwards on a slide. A feeding device feeds in foil (17) to cover trays when full. The successive tray carriers are linked by movable, flexible coupling links.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Verpackungsmaschine mit einem Rahmen 1 mit einer Eingangsseite 2 und einer Ausgangsseite 3 und einer Mehrzahl auf einer Bahn von der Eingangsseite zur Ausgangsseite nacheinander angeordneten Schalenträgern 4 zum Aufnehmen von Schalen 16 geschaffen. Es ist ein Antrieb 9, 13 zum Vorwärtsbewegen der Schalenträger 4 in einer Vorschubebene vorgesehen. Ferner ist eine Zuführeinrichtung zum Zuführen einer Oberfolie 17 zum Abdecken der gefüllten Schale 16 vorhanden. Jeweils aufeinanderfolgende Schalenträger 4 sind mittels beweglicher Verbindungsglieder 6 gelenkig verbunden. An jedem Schalenträger sind kopfseitig und rückseitig Eingriffselemente 8 vorgesehen. Der Antrieb ist als ein um Umlenkrollen 10, 12 geführtes Kettentrum 9 ausgebildet, in welches die Eingriffselemente 8 in ihrer dem ersten Kettentrum 9 benachbarten Position eingreifen. Eine Zuführeinrichtung ist für die Oberfolie 17 vorgesehen, die ebenfalls seitlich geführte Kettentrume 21 aufweist, welche über einen vorbestimmten Weg in einer zum ersten Kettentrum 9 parallelen Ebene parallel zu dem ersten Kettentrum und in einem vorbestimmten Abstand von diesem geführt sind. Die Eingriffselemente 9 greifen über einen vorbestimmten Weg mit dem antreibenden Kettentrum 9 und über einen vorbestimmten Weg mit dem zweiten Kettentrum 21 in Eingriff, so daß beide Ketten durch ein und denselben Antrieb in Bewegung gesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/00 (2006.01); B65B 7/16 (2006.01); B65B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/164 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] GB 1120950 A 19680724 - ANDERSON BROS MFG CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038773 A1 20000927; EP 1038773 B1 20020703; CA 2300755 A1 20000919; CA 2300755 C 20070821; DE 19912491 A1 20000928; ES 2178983 T3 20030116; JP 2000289701 A 20001017; JP 4382239 B2 20091209; US 6282866 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50000251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MULTIVAC SEPP HAGGENMUELLER SE & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50000251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50000251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130309

2014-06-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140611

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130308

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130308

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130308

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120405

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178983

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-08

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI