Global patent index - EP 1038774 A1

EP 1038774 A1 2000-09-27 - Bag with transverse closure profiles and closure means for its manufacture

Title (en)

Bag with transverse closure profiles and closure means for its manufacture

Title (de)

Beutel mit transversalen Verschlussprofilen und Verschlussmittel zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Sachet à profilés de fermeture transversaux et moyen de fermeture pour sa réalisation

Publication

EP 1038774 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00105724 A

Priority

  • EP 98952839 A
  • FR 9713944 A

Abstract (en)

The machine comprises arrangement (200, 202) for routing the film (F), and a closing member (300) comprising two support voiles. There is a first longitudinal assembly formed by two complementary sections connected to the support voiles and a second longitudinal assembly located at a distance from the first. The support voiles are brought together between the two longitudinal assemblies so that the distance separating the lateral edges of the two voiles increases as a result of their deformation. Two rectilinear guides (170, 180) are able to penetrate into the space between each pair of lateral edges of the support voiles.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un emballage comprenant deux paires (302, 304) de profilés de fermeture (312, 322, 314, 324) de type mâle/femelle complémentaires, disposées au niveau de l'embouchure de l'emballage, à raison d'un profilé mâle (322, 314) et d'un profilé femelle (321, 324) sur chacun des feuillets composant l'emballage. La présente invention concerne également un moyen de fermeture pour la réalisation de cet emballage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/20; B31B 19/90; B65D 33/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/90 (2006.01); B65B 9/00 (2006.01); B65B 9/20 (2012.01); B65D 33/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/188 (2013.01); B31B 19/90 (2013.01); B65B 9/20 (2013.01); B65D 33/2525 (2013.01); B65D 33/2533 (2013.01); B65D 33/2541 (2013.01); B31B 2219/9022 (2013.01); Y10S 493/927 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770487 A1 19990507; FR 2770487 B1 20000204; AR 016673 A1 20010725; AT 215463 T 20020415; AT 236829 T 20030415; AU 1038999 A 19990531; AU 745091 B2 20020314; BR 9806842 A 20000314; CA 2253066 A1 19990506; CA 2253066 C 20040824; CN 1144730 C 20040407; CN 1246832 A 20000308; DE 69804582 D1 20020508; DE 69804582 T2 20020919; DE 69813292 D1 20030515; DE 69813292 T2 20040401; DK 0938427 T3 20020729; DK 1038774 T3 20030804; EP 0938427 A2 19990901; EP 0938427 B1 20020403; EP 1038774 A1 20000927; EP 1038774 B1 20030409; ES 2172932 T3 20021001; ES 2190915 T3 20030901; IL 130573 A 20020210; IL 130573 D0 20000601; JP 2001507644 A 20010612; JP 4394173 B2 20100106; NZ 336502 A 20010928; NZ 513500 A 20021126; PL 200030 B1 20081128; PL 335422 A1 20000425; PT 938427 E 20020830; US 6032437 A 20000307; WO 9924322 A2 19990520; WO 9924322 A3 19990902; ZA 9810113 B 19990507

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2015-08-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190915

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-07-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2003-05-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0938427

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-09-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 938427

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE