Global Patent Index - EP 1038776 A2

EP 1038776 A2 2000-09-27 - Method and tool for manually binding a compacted bale of material in a bale-press

Title (en)

Method and tool for manually binding a compacted bale of material in a bale-press

Title (de)

Verfahren und Werkzeug zum manuellen Abbinden eines gepressten Materialballens in einer Ballenpresse

Title (fr)

Procédé et outil de liage manuel d'une balle de matériau comprimé dans une presse à balles

Publication

EP 1038776 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102045 A

Priority

DE 19903828 A

Abstract (en)

The tight tensioning of the band(3) is effected by a tensioning lever to which the band is temporarily fixed. The lever is placed by one of its end sections on the press plate(11) and by moving its other end section is pivoted(R) around the contact point. The lever as a combination tool(1) serves two functions in that it is used to draw out the band from the rear to the front along the pressed material bale(2) and also to tension the band connected to its end. The separating or cutting of the band is also carried out by the combination tool.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und ein Werkzeug (1) für das manuelle Abbinden eines Materialballens (2) in einer Ballenpresse, die zum Verarbeiten von Verpackungsmaterialien vorgesehen ist, wobei nach der Fertigstellung eines Materialballens mittels eines Bandziehers das auf einer Vorratsrolle befindliche Umreifungsband (3) über die nach dem Preßvorgang entstandene Ballenoberseite von hinten nach vorn zu einer Sockelleiste (18) gezogen wird und mit einem dort vor dem Preßbeginn am Sockel der Ballenpresse unterhalb der entstehenden Ballenunterseite befestigten freien Schlaufenende (6) des Umreifungsbandes nach dessen Lösen verbunden oder durchgeschlauft wird, die für einen Bediener einer Ballenpresse fertigungstechnisch vereinfacht sind und einen geringeren Arbeitszeitaufwand erfordern, dadurch, dass bei einem neuen Verfahren mit neu gestalteten Werkzeugen, wobei deren Funktionsteile im speziellen zu einem Kombiwerkzeug vereint sind, vorzugsweise das Ziehen sowie das Spannen und/oder Trennen des Umreifungsbandes mittels dieses Kombiwerkzeuges erfolgt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2006.01); B65B 13/22 (2006.01); B65B 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2013.01); B65B 13/22 (2013.01); B65B 27/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29616888 U1 19961212 - STRAUTMANN UMWELTTECHNIK UND R [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 10004379 A1 20000817; EP 1038776 A2 20000927; EP 1038776 A3 20020206; EP 1038776 B1 20031210

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004685 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI