Global Patent Index - EP 1038781 A1

EP 1038781 A1 2000-09-27 - Labelling device

Title (en)

Labelling device

Title (de)

Etikettierstation

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étiquetage

Publication

EP 1038781 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104626 A

Priority

DE 19913172 A

Abstract (en)

The bottle labelling plant has working stations (12, 13, 14) arranged around a carrier and withdrawing devices (2) which swing out to move the bottles in front of each station as it is reached. The guides (18, 19) on the withdrawing devices have lever arms of uniform length and the geometry of the curve of the withdrawing devices is designed so that, at least between the labelling box (13) and the smoothing cylinder (14), the curved surface (2') of the withdrawal device is oriented outwards towards the free space.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Etikettierstation für Gegenstände mit mehreren längs einer Bahn hintereinander angeordneten Stationen. Bei solchen Etikettiermaschinen strebt man neben einer kompakten Bauweise Laufruhe und geringe Belastung der am Antrieb beteiligten Elemente an. Mit der Erfindung soll eine verbesserte Getriebegestaltung geschaffen werden, mit welcher insbesondere eine zusätzlich nach außen gerichtete Position der Entnahmeelemente zur Verfügung gestellt werden kann. Hierzu sieht die Erfindung vor, daß die Eingriffsglieder (18,19) der Entnahmeelemente (2,3,4,5) in an sich bekannter Weise gleichlange wirksame Hebelarme aufweisen, die auf einem gleichen Teilkreis zu ihrer Rotationsachse liegen und die Geometrie der Doppelkurvenscheibe derart ausgebildet ist, daß nach Abwälzen der Entnahmeelemente an den Stationen aus dieser Drehstellung mindestens zwischen dem Etikettenkasten (13) und dem Greiferzylinder (14) diese Entnahmeelemente (2-5) in eine solche Drehung versetzt werden, mit der deren gekrümmte Aufnahmefläche (2'-5') im freien Bereich nach außen weist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038781 A1 20000927; EP 1038781 B1 20020731; DE 19913172 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-01-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000323 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI