Global Patent Index - EP 1038782 A1

EP 1038782 A1 2000-09-27 - In line production of solid objects

Title (en)

In line production of solid objects

Title (de)

Fliessfertigung von festen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Production en continu d'objets solides

Publication

EP 1038782 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870055 A

Priority

EP 99870055 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process for producing a solid object (4) comprising a first step, the first step consisting in applying a first substance onto a selected surface area by use of first application means (5), the selected surface area and the solid object being both in motion relative to the first application means and the selected surface area being solely in contact with the first substance during the first step. The process also comprises a second step consists in applying a second substance onto the selected surface area by use of second application means after completion of the first step, the selected surface area and the solid object being both in motion relative to the second application means and the selected surface area being solely in contact with the second substance during the second step, the process taking place at a continuous line speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/46; B65B 61/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B65B 61/26 (2006.01); B65C 9/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/46 (2013.01); B41J 3/4073 (2013.01); B65B 61/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038782 A1 20000927; AT 254068 T 20031115; AU 3758200 A 20001009; BR 0009288 A 20020122; CA 2366598 A1 20000928; CN 1344213 A 20020410; CZ 20013308 A3 20020213; DE 60006504 D1 20031218; EP 1163156 A1 20011219; EP 1163156 B1 20031112; ES 2206209 T3 20040516; HU 0200392 A2 20020529; IL 145372 D0 20020630; JP 2002539979 A 20021126; MA 25402 A1 20020401; NO 20014580 A 20010920; NO 20014580 D0 20010920; TR 200102703 T2 20020121; WO 0056609 A1 20000928; ZA 200107685 B 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-09-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI