Global Patent Index - EP 1038783 A1

EP 1038783 A1 2000-09-27 - Box of a semi-rigid material, comprising a body and a reclosable lid

Title (en)

Box of a semi-rigid material, comprising a body and a reclosable lid

Title (de)

Verpackung aus halbsteifem Material mit einem Körper und wiederverschliesbarem Dekkel

Title (fr)

Boîte en matériau sémirigide, comprenant un corps et un couvercle refermable

Publication

EP 1038783 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400819 A

Priority

FR 9903818 A

Abstract (en)

The box is formed from a semi-rigid material with a lid section (1) defined as part of one of the upper quarter of the box. The box is sealed by a perforated tear strip that is terminated at a circular cut out (19). Once the lid is opened, an opening is defined wherein the products can be accessed .

Abstract (fr)

Dans ce conditionnement, un élément structurel distinct du corps du conditionnement ou attenant à l'une des parois latérales de celui-ci est disposé à l'intérieur du corps et comporte une partie (10a, 10b) rigidement solidaire de la face interne d'une paroi (1), cet élément comportant au moins une patte (14) articulée sur lui par une ligne de pliage et repliée vers l'intérieur du corps, cette patte étant disposée de façon telle qu'en position de fermeture du conditionnement, elle soit sollicitée par l'élasticité du matériau semi-rigide en direction du logement (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/542 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038783 A1 20000927; FR 2791321 A1 20000929; FR 2791321 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Inventor name: CHRETIEN, PIERRE

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Inventor name: DIXNEUF, CLAUDE

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MANSON, ALIX

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHRETIEN, PIERRE

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DIXNEUF, CLAUDE

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI