Global Patent Index - EP 1038785 A2

EP 1038785 A2 2000-09-27 - Plastic bottle, suitable for stacking after consumption of its content

Title (en)

Plastic bottle, suitable for stacking after consumption of its content

Title (de)

Nach Verbrauch seines Inhalts stapelbare Kunststoffflasche

Title (fr)

Bouteille en matière plastique empilable après consommation de son contenu

Publication

EP 1038785 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104900 A

Priority

IT GE990028 A

Abstract (en)

Plastic container, preferably a bottle, particularly suitable for the stacking after the consumption of its content, comprising a mouth end (101; 102; 103; 104), a bottom end (201; 202; 203; 204) and a continuous side wall (301; 302, 402; 303, 403; 304, 404, 504); once determinated a cross separating plane of the said container dividing the said container in two substantial portions (1a, 1b; 2a, 2b; 3a, 3b; 4a, 4b), the separation being complete or incomplete, at least one of the said portions comprises dilating means (311; 412; 413; 514) of its cross section, means for guiding (311; 412; 413, 313; 514) the insertion in the said portion of a corresponding second portion, and means of mutual restraint (311; 412, 502, 512, 602, 612; 413, 703, 713; 514, 604, 614) of the said portions of container. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 8/14 (2006.01); B65D 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/0233 (2013.01); B65D 1/0223 (2013.01); B65D 2501/0054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038785 A2 20000927; EP 1038785 A3 20030312; IT 1309461 B1 20020123; IT GE990028 A1 20000911

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-10 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MELONI VINI S.R.L

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MELONI, GIANFRANCO

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI