Global Patent Index - EP 1038793 A1

EP 1038793 A1 2000-09-27 - Article comprising a cell system

Title (en)

Article comprising a cell system

Title (de)

Artikel mit einem Zellensystem

Title (fr)

Article comprenant une système cellulaire

Publication

EP 1038793 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870052 A

Priority

EP 99870052 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is directed to a cell system (10) comprising at least one burstable cell (11) filled with an active composition, the cell system being characterized in that at least one cell comprises at least one easy opening means (30). Preferably, the cell system is associated with a dispersing element (12), such as for example a fibrous pad, or cotton pad. Preferably, the force required to burst the cells is comprised within the range 10 to 80 N. More preferably, said at least one cell is made out of a material through which less than 10% product is lost per year at 35 DEG C/20%RH, and more preferably, said material is a laminate comprising at least one layer of aluminium. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/58; B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 35/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3272 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038793 A1 20000927; EP 1038793 B1 20051026; AU 3891000 A 20001009; DE 69927939 D1 20051201; DE 69927939 T2 20060727; EP 1163164 A1 20011219; WO 0056626 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080319

2007-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070202

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927939 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031112

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI