Global Patent Index - EP 1038796 A2

EP 1038796 A2 2000-09-27 - Container for pasty or fluid material and metered delivery thereof

Title (en)

Container for pasty or fluid material and metered delivery thereof

Title (de)

Behälter zur Aufbewahrung von pastösen oder fluiden Massen und deren dosierter Abgabe

Title (fr)

Conteneur pour matière pâteuse ou fluide et sa distribution dosée

Publication

EP 1038796 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105824 A

Priority

DE 29905147 U

Abstract (en)

Container for dosed delivery of paste or fluid material, comprises a body (1) with parallel inner walls (3), and a plunger type press plate (10,11) which can move in the container and which divides it into a lower section (12) and an upper section (13) that holds the paste or fluid. Container for dosed delivery of paste or fluid material, comprises a body (1) with parallel inner walls (3), and a plunger type press plate (10,11) which can move in the container and which divides it into a lower section (12) and an upper section (13) that holds the paste or fluid. An opening for compressed air is located below the press plate and allows compressed air to be blown into the bottom of the container. The container lid (2) has a delivery opening for the material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Behälter zur Aufbewahrung von pastösen oder fluiden Massen (14) und deren dosierter Abgabe. Der Behälter besteht aus einem Behälterkörper (1) mit parallelen Innenwänden (3); einem beweglichen Kolbenelement (10), das den Behälterkörper in einen Druckluftabschnitt (12) und einen Vorratsabschnitt (13) zur Aufnahme der pastösen oder fluiden Masse (14) unterteilt und das durch Einleiten von Druckluft in den Druckluftabschnitt in den Vorratsabschnitt verschiebbar ist; einer Druckluftzufuhröffnung (6), über welche von einem Versorgungselement (16) Druckluft einblasbar ist; einem Behälterdeckel (2); und einer Abgabeöffnung im Vorratsabschnitt (13), aus der die Masse (14), gesteuert über die Menge an zugeführter Druckluft, austritt. Der Behälter ermöglicht eine besonders einfache und leicht dosierbare Entnahme der enthaltenen Masse, wobei auch eine Bedienung mit nur einer Hand möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/02; B05C 17/015; B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/02 (2010.01); B05C 17/015 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B67D 7/72 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0227 (2013.01); B05C 17/015 (2013.01); B67D 7/0238 (2013.01); B67D 7/72 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905147 U1 20000803; AT 508982 T 20110515; EP 1038796 A2 20000927; EP 1038796 A3 20040707; EP 1038796 B1 20110511; US 6375047 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50016106

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50016106

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 508982 T

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EGS ELEKTRO- UND HAUSGERATEWERK SUHL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KONIETZKO, ALBRECHT

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-06-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016106

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2012-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-02-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2012-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-12-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110822

2011-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110912

2011-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-09-07 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-06-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016106

- Effective date: 20110622

2011-06-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2011-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-12-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERDA, NORBERT

2010-12-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONIETZKO, ALBRECHT

2010-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67D 7/02 20100101AFI20101102BHEP

2010-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 17/015 20060101ALI20101102BHEP

2010-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 83/00 20060101ALI20101102BHEP

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070920

2005-03-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050107

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 67D 5/02 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 17/015 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 83/00 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI