Global patent index - EP 1038812 A2

EP 1038812 A2 2000-09-27 - Method and device for controlling a stream of documents

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling a stream of documents

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Durchlaufsteuerung von Druckträgern

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour le contrôle d'un débit de documents

Publication

EP 1038812 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250056 A

Priority

DE 19913065 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves transporting an item laterally from a stack and passing it to a following device. The items are transported faster in a functional area before a transition region than in the transition region until the item has reached the transition region, whereby the transition speed to the next device is matched to the transport speed. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Durchlaufsteuerung von Druckträgern A, insbesondere von Briefen, in einer Vereinzelungsvorrichtung B eines Briefpostverarbeitungssystems, bei der die Druckträger A ausgangsseitig mittels eines Auswurfmittels 9 an eine Nachfolgeeinrichtung 16, wie eine Waage oder Frankiermaschine übergeben werden. Es wird eine Vergrößerung des Einsatzbereiches angestrebt. Aufgabengemäß soll der Briefdurchsatz an den in der Nachfolgeeinrichtung 16 angepaßt werden. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Übergabegeschwindigkeit in Abhängigkeit von der Transportgeschwindigkeit der Nachfolgeeinrichtung eingestellt und in den übrigen Bereichen der Vereinzelungsvorrichtung B wird die Transportgeschwindigkeit in Abhängigkeit von der jeweiligen Brieflage optimiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/02; B65H 3/06; B65H 5/34; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/34 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); B65H 3/0653 (2013.01); B65H 5/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/321 (2013.01); B65H 2513/104 (2013.01); B65H 2513/22 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01); Y10S 209/90 (2013.01); Y10S 209/91 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2513/104 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2513/22 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038812 A2 20000927; EP 1038812 A3 20010816; EP 1038812 B1 20040526; DE 19913065 A1 20001012; DE 19913065 C2 20010222; US 6378863 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006548

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006548

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 1/02 A, 7B 65H 5/34 B, 7B 65H 3/06 B, 7G 07B 17/00 B, 7B 07C 1/04 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI