Global Patent Index - EP 1038815 A2

EP 1038815 A2 2000-09-27 - Winding machine for continuously winding a material web

Title (en)

Winding machine for continuously winding a material web

Title (de)

Wickelmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Machine d'enroulage pour enrouler de façon continue une bande de matière

Publication

EP 1038815 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125353 A

Priority

DE 19908496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19908496A1] The machine for continuous reeling of materials, in particular, paper and cardboard incorporates an air excluder unit (12) which comes into operation against the material roll (6) when the latter is almost completed. The air excluder unit takes the form of a compound element (13) which is mounted on a frame (16). The air excluder is made up of a main body (14) and a low-friction lining (15) on the surface likely to come into contact with the material being reeled.

Abstract (de)

Wickelmaschine (1) zum kontinuierlichen Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn (4), insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, auf einen Tambour (10) zu einer Wickelrolle (6), a, mit einer Tragtrommel (2), die mit der Wickelrolle (6) einen Nip (7) bildet, b, mit einer mindestens eine Transporteinrichtung umfassenden Lagerung, die den Tambour (10) entlang einer bevorzugterweise horizontalen Führungsbahn führt und c, mit einer im unteren Bereich der Wickelmaschine (1) angebrachten Luftabquetschvorrichtung (12), die an die Wickelrolle (6) anlegbar ist, wobei die Luftabquetschvorrichtung (12) als mindestens ein auf mindestens einem Rahmen (16) angebrachtes Verbundelement (13) mit einem Grundkörper (14) und einem an der möglichen Kontaktfläche angebrachten reibungsarmen Belag (15) ausgebildet ist, oder die Luftabquetschvorrichtung (12) aus mindestens einem auf mindestens einem Rahmen (21) angebrachten Kontaktelement (20) mit der Form eines Tragflügels und mit einem reibungsarmen Belag (15) besteht, oder die Luftabquetschvorrichtung (12) aus einer Anordnung mehrerer kleiner Einzelrollen (17) besteht, die auf mindestens einem Rahmen (18) angebracht sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19908496 A1 20000831; EP 1038815 A2 20000927; EP 1038815 A3 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 18/26 A, 7B 65H 19/22 B

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI