Global patent index - EP 1038825 A1

EP 1038825 A1 2000-09-27 - Lifting device for lifting heavy loads, in particular derailed railway vehicles

Title (en)

Lifting device for lifting heavy loads, in particular derailed railway vehicles

Title (de)

Hebeeinrichtung zum Anheben schwerer Lasten, insbesondere entgleister Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage pour lever des charges lourdes, en particulier des véhicules ferroviaires déraillés

Publication

EP 1038825 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105907 A

Priority

EP 99105907 A

Abstract (en)

The lifting device has at least one preferably hydraulic, cylinder (2) for operating a mechanical ram (3) which is separated from the cylinder and is housed in a guide tube (4). The ram is preferably hollow with a tool insert (6) at the front end. A socket such as a bayonet lock can be provided on a guide tube (4) to connect up with the vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Hebeeinrichtung zum Anheben schwerer Lasten, z.B. entgleister Schienenfahrzeuge, zum permanenten oder zeitweisen Einbau mit mindestens einem Zylinder, insbesondere Hydraulikzylinder, zur Betätigung eines mechanischen Stempels, wobei Zylinder 2 und Stempel 3 voneinander getrennt sind und der Stempel 3 in einem Führungsrohr 4 untergebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 3/26; B66F 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 5/00 (2006.01); B66F 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 3/24 (2013.01); B61K 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038825 A1 20000927; EP 1038825 B1 20040929; DE 59910653 D1 20041104

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-03-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LUKAS HYDRAULIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2005-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LUKAS HYDRAULIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2005-01-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LUKAS HYDRAULIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910653

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI