Global Patent Index - EP 1038826 A1

EP 1038826 A1 2000-09-27 - Hoisting device with a mast having a carrying equipment

Title (en)

Hoisting device with a mast having a carrying equipment

Title (de)

Hebezeug mit einem Mast mit einer Tragvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Engin de levage avec un mât pourvu d'un porte-équipement

Publication

EP 1038826 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400752 A

Priority

FR 9903483 A

Abstract (en)

The truck (1) may have an engine compartment behind the driver's seat (9), and has small steered wheels (4) at the back and large driven wheels (3) at the front. The lifting mast (2) at the front may be as in known practice, but the usual elongated forks are replaced by a plate (35) which is hinged (36) at the bottom and may be positioned at a variable angle (alpha) to the vertical. Conical projections at the ends of the plate may engage in corresponding sockets in the equipment being lifted.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte à un porte-équipement (35) pour engin de levage (1), comprenant des moyens aptes à permettre son déplacement selon une direction transversale, des moyens aptes à permettre son inclinaison par rotation vers l'avant, des moyens aptes à permettre la fixation rapide et le verrouillage d'équipements variés tels que fourche, godet, hydraugriffe ou équivalent. L'invention se rapporte également à un mât de levage pour engin de levage, comprenant un tel porte-équipement, ainsi qu'à un engin de levage pourvu dudit mât. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/16; B66F 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/14 (2006.01); B66F 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/148 (2013.01); B66F 9/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038826 A1 20000927; FR 2791049 A1 20000922; FR 2791049 B1 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050405

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOBCAT FRANCE SA

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI