Global Patent Index - EP 1038869 A1

EP 1038869 A1 2000-09-27 - Process for the production of 3-alkyl-3-hydroxymethyloxetanes

Title (en)

Process for the production of 3-alkyl-3-hydroxymethyloxetanes

Title (de)

Verfahren zu Herstellung von 3-Alkyl-3-Hydroxymethyloxetanen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la production de 3-alkyl-3-hydroxymethyloxetanes

Publication

EP 1038869 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99105013 A

Priority

EP 99105013 A

Abstract (en)

A process is described for the production of 3-alkyl-3-hydroxymethyloxetanes of the general formula 1, <CHEM> in which R<1> denotes a linear or branched C1-C12 alkyl group, which process comprises reacting a trimethylolalkane of the general formula 2, (HO-CH2)3C-R<1> in which R<1> is defined as above, with a dialkyl carbonate of the general formula 3, R<2>-O-(C=O)-O-R<2> in which R<2> denotes a linear or branched C1-C4 alkyl group, in the presence of a basic catalyst, wherein in a first stage the reaction mixture is stirred for at least 6 hours with refluxing at a temperature of 90-120 DEG C, in a second stage the alcohol formed R2OH is distilled off at the same temperature and in a third stage the product formed is decarboxylated and deoligomerised at a temperature of 125-150 DEG C and the desired 3-alkyl-3-hydroxymethyloxetane is simultaneously distilled off. The process according to the invention makes it possible to obtain the desired 3-alkyl-3-hydroxymethyloxetanes at elevated purity and in particular without a content of odorous secondary products without an additional purification stage being required to separate secondary products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 305/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 305/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 305/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038869 A1 20000927; EP 1038869 B1 20030514; DE 69907865 D1 20030618; DE 69907865 T2 20031009; JP 2000273093 A 20001003; US 6166228 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69907865

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907865 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GAUDL, KAI-UWE, DR.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LACHOWICZ, ARTUR, DR.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFFMANN, ANDREAS

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAHE, GERWALD, DR.

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI