Global Patent Index - EP 1038896 A2

EP 1038896 A2 2000-09-27 - Amido functional amine catalysts for the production of polyurethanes

Title (en)

Amido functional amine catalysts for the production of polyurethanes

Title (de)

Amidofunktionnelle Aminkatalysatoren zur Herstellung von Polyurethanen

Title (fr)

Catalyseurs d'amine contenant une fonctionnalité amido pour la préparation de polyuréthanes

Publication

EP 1038896 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106352 A

Priority

US 27696299 A

Abstract (en)

The use of 3-Ä3-(dimethylamino)propylÜ-propionamide (Formula I) and 3,3 @ -äÄ3-(dimethylamino)propylÜiminoü bis-propanamide (Formula II) as catalysts in the production of polyurethanes. <CHEM>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/18 (2006.01); C08G 18/40 (2006.01); C08G 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/4072 (2013.01); C08G 18/1841 (2013.01); C08G 2101/00 (2013.01); Y10S 521/902 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038896 A2 20000927; EP 1038896 A3 20011031; BR 0001378 A 20001017; CN 1227278 C 20051116; CN 1268524 A 20001004; JP 2000290338 A 20001017; JP 3498038 B2 20040216; KR 100349700 B1 20030124; US 6156814 A 20001205; US RE38201 E 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050118

2002-08-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FI

2002-04-24 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020123

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI