Global Patent Index - EP 1038946 A2

EP 1038946 A2 2000-09-27 - N-acylimines as bleach catalysts

Title (en)

N-acylimines as bleach catalysts

Title (de)

N-Acylimine als Bleichkatalysatoren

Title (fr)

N-Acylimine comme catalysateurs de blanchiment

Publication

EP 1038946 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112891 A

Priority

  • EP 97940038 A
  • US 2447996 P

Abstract (en)

Novel bleaches, a method for bleaching substrates using these materials and detergent compositions containing same are reported. The bleaches are N-acylimines. Substrates such as fabrics may be bleached in an aqueous solution containing the N-acylimines and a peroxygen compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038946 A2 20000927; EP 1038946 A3 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 11D 3/39 A, 7C 11D 3/395 B, 7C 11D 3/26 B

2000-09-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 922090

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT