Global Patent Index - EP 1038951 A1

EP 1038951 A1 2000-09-27 - Synthetic medium for cultivating lactobacillus and/or bifidobacteria

Title (en)

Synthetic medium for cultivating lactobacillus and/or bifidobacteria

Title (de)

Synthetisches Mittel für die Züchtung von Lactobacillus und/oder die Bifidobacterien

Title (fr)

Milieu de synthèse pour la culture de Lactobacillus et/ou des Bifidobactéries

Publication

EP 1038951 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99105855 A

Priority

EP 99105855 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a novel defined medium suitable to cultivate lactic acid bacteria, such as Lactobacillus or Bifidobacteria. In particular the present invention pertains to the use of said medium for the isolation of bioactive molecules or functional metabolites.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12R 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/20 (2013.01); Y10S 435/854 (2013.01); Y10S 435/855 (2013.01); Y10S 435/856 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0460414 A2 19911211 - KAJANDER E OLAVI [FI]
  • [A] EP 0656421 A1 19950607 - BIO MERIEUX [FR]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 122 (C - 168) 26 May 1983 (1983-05-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 337 (C - 0862) 27 August 1991 (1991-08-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038951 A1 20000927; AR 023141 A1 20020904; BR 0001392 A 20010502; CA 2299937 A1 20000923; CA 2299937 C 20081216; JP 2000279166 A 20001010; JP 3690958 B2 20050831; US 6340585 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050801

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031212

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI