Global Patent Index - EP 1038976 A1

EP 1038976 A1 2000-09-27 - Method of granulating and pulverizing slag or metal melts

Title (en)

Method of granulating and pulverizing slag or metal melts

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Granulieren und Zerkleinern von flüssigen Schmelzen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour granuler et pulvériser des laitiers ou métaux en fusion

Publication

EP 1038976 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890083 A

Priority

AT 55099 A

Abstract (en)

A melt granulation and comminution process, comprising gas heating of sprayed droplets within a cooling chamber having cooled walls, is new. A melt granulation and comminution process comprises spraying the melt into a cooling chamber using a fluid jet, the sprayed melt droplets being heated in the spray jet by post-combustion of hot gases within the cooling chamber and the cooling chamber walls being cooled to a surface temperature of below 400 (preferably below 300) degrees C.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Granulieren und Zerkleinern von flüssigen Schmelzen (2), insbesondere Schlacken oder Metallschmelzen, bei welchem die flüssigen Schlacken mit einem Fluidstrahl (5) in eine Kühlkammer (4) versprüht werden. Zur Verbesserung der Materialeigenschaften des Granulates wird so vorgegangen, daß die versprühten Schmelzentröpfchen im Sprühstrahl (3) durch Nachverbrennung (9) von Heißgasen im Inneren der Kühlkammer auf Temperaturen zwischen 1500°C und 1750°C aufgeheizt werden und daß die Wände der Kühlkammer auf Oberflächentemperaturen von unter 400°C, vorzugsweise unter 300°C gekühlt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 3/08; B01J 2/02; B22F 9/08; C04B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/082 (2013.01); B22F 2009/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038976 A1 20000927; EP 1038976 B1 20011121; AT 407224 B 20010125; AT A55099 A 20000615; DE 50000083 D1 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HOLCIM LTD

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-04-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030402

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-04-01 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000083 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOLCIM LTD.

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT LU

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI