Global patent index - EP 1038978 A1

EP 1038978 A1 2000-09-27 - Process for manufacturing hot strip

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing hot strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Warmbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour produire une bande laminée à chaud

Publication

EP 1038978 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103097 A

Priority

DE 19913498 A

Abstract (en)

Hot rolled microalloyed steel strip production, uses inter-stand cooling to allow final rolling passes at a temperature below the recrystallization temperature. Production of hot rolled strip (W) of unalloyed or low alloy steel containing micro-alloying elements, from optionally reheated continuously cast slabs, plates or strip, comprises: (a) feeding strip into the first stand (F1) of a tandem finishing line (FS) at 30 degrees C above the recrystallization end temperature (TR); (b) continuously rolling the strip in one or more passes in the austenite recrystallization region; (c) cooling the strip between adjacent stands (F1-F7) by cooling devices (K2-K7) to 20 degrees C below the recrystallization end temperature (TR) at a cooling rate of 10 degrees C/sec.; and (d) rolling the strip at below the recrystallization end temperature (TR) in several passes with a total deformation ( epsilon h) of 30%. An Independent claim is also included for a hot strip line for carrying out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines Warmbandes (W), das basierend auf einem unlegierten oder niedrig legierten Stahl mit Zusätzen von Mikrolegierungselementen aus Strangguß in Form von wiedererwärmten oder direkt aus der Gießhitze eingesetzten Brammen, Dünnbrammen oder gegossenem Band erzeugt wird, wobei das Warmband (W) eine aus mehreren Walzgerüsten (F1 - F7) gebildete Fertigstaffel (FS) durchläuft. Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren umfasst die folgenden Schritte: Einleiten des Warmbandes (W) in das erste Walzgerüst (F1) der Fertigstaffel (FS) mit einer Temperatur (T1), welche um mindestens 30 °C über der Rekristallisationsstop-Temperatur (TREK-STOP) liegt, kontinuierlich erfolgendes Walzen des Warmbandes (W) in einem oder mehreren Stichen im Rekristallisationsbereich des Austenits; Abkühlen des Warmbandes (W) zwischen zwei Walzgerüsten (F1,F2;F2,F3;F3,F4;F4,F5;F5,F6;F6,F7) mittels einer Kühleinrichtung (K2 - K7) auf eine Temperatur (T2), welche mindestens 20 °C unterhalb der Rekristallisationsstop-Temperatur (TREK-STOP) liegt, mit einer Abkühlgeschwindigkeit, welche mindestens 10 °C/s beträgt; Walzen des unterhalb der Rekristallisationsstop-Temperatur (TREK-STOP) abgekühlten Warmbandes (W) in mehreren Stichen bei einem Gesamtumformgrad (h) von mindestens 30 % im Temperaturbereich unterhalb der Rekristallisationsstop-Temperatur (TREK-STOP). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/02; B21B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/26 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/28 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0226 (2013.01); B21B 1/26 (2013.01); B21B 1/28 (2013.01); B21B 1/46 (2013.01); B21B 45/0218 (2013.01); B21B 2201/04 (2013.01); C21D 8/0236 (2013.01); C21D 8/0278 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9006821 A1 19900628 - DAVY MCKEE SHEFFIELD [GB]
  • [DY] DE 19725434 A1 19981224 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]
  • [Y] DE 3437637 A1 19860424 - THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]
  • [A] WO 9641024 A1 19961219 - IPSCO INC [CA]
  • [A] US 4662950 A 19870505 - ABRAMS HALLE [US], et al
  • [A] DILG C ET AL: "TMCP PROCESS INCLUDING TWO ACCELERATED COOLING STAGES", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE,FR,REVUE DE METALLURGIE. PARIS, vol. 92, no. 7/08, 1 July 1995 (1995-07-01), pages 883 - 892, XP000550405, ISSN: 0035-1563
  • [AD] KAUP K ET AL: "OPTIMIERUNG DER WARMWALZBEDINGUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG UND VERGLEICHMAESSIGUNG DER WERKSTOFFEIGENSCHAFTEN", STAHL UND EISEN,DE,VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH. DUSSELDORF, vol. 104, no. 20, 1984, pages 1017 - 1024, XP000907087, ISSN: 0340-4803

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038978 A1 20000927; EP 1038978 B1 20040512; AT 266741 T 20040515; DE 19913498 C1 20001012; ES 2220272 T3 20041216

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20090423

2009-07-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20090423

2009-07-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20090423

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20050214

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2007-09-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-07-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2005-04-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2220272

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-08-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-08-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAWALLA, RUDOLF, PROF. DR.-ING.

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HELLER,THOMAS, DR.-ING.

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ENGL, BERNHARD, DR.-ING.

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FRIEDRICH, KARL ERNST, DIPL.-ING.

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PIRCHER, HANS, DR.-ING.

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMITZ, HANS-PETER, DIPL.-ING.

2004-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING HOT STRIP

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI